ND HB1315 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 027 nays 060
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 027 nays 060
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Erbele, Klein A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 43-28.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a grant program for dentists in rural communities; to provide an appropriation; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Erbele, Klein A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 43-28.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a grant program for dentists in rural communities; to provide an appropriation; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-23 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 027 nays 060 | |
2009-01-22 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 003 | |
2009-01-20 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1315.html |