ND HB1319 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 010 nays 080
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 010 nays 080
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Dotzenrod A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 35-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to rescission periods for mortgages.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Dotzenrod A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 35-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to rescission periods for mortgages.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Conklin [D] | Rep. Bette Grande [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Mike Schatz [R] |
Rep. Dwight Wrangham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-23 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 010 nays 080 | |
2009-01-21 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-20 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1319.html |