ND HB1348 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Lyson, Wanzek A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 62.1-02-04 and 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the possession of a firearm or dangerous weapon by a person licensed to carry a concealed weapon.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Lyson, Wanzek A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 62.1-02-04 and 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the possession of a firearm or dangerous weapon by a person licensed to carry a concealed weapon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-10 | Motion to reconsider laid on table | |
2009-04-10 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 023 nays 023 | |
2009-04-06 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 003 n 002 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 048 nays 046 | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 009 n 004 | |
2009-01-30 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1348.html |