ND HB1361 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 8 of section 1-01-49 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of person; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The definition of person; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12 |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2023-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 5, Emergency clause carried |
2023-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2023-03-16 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:37 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 7, Emergency clause carried |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1 |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 03:40 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred to Human Services |