ND HB1399 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Signed by Governor 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Signed by Governor 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 14-05-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to termination of spousal support; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide for application.
Title
Termination of spousal support; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Signed by Governor 04/27 |
2015-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 36 nays 10 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 17 |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hogue Casper Nelson |
2015-04-20 | House | Conference committee appointed Maragos Brabandt M. Johnson |
2015-04-20 | House | Refused to concur |
2015-04-02 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2015-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 0 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |