ND HB1448 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15-06-02, subsection 7 of section 15.1-11-04, and section 54-01-13.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the composition of the county board of appraisers, required annual training, and land appraisal requirements.
Title
The composition of the county board of appraisers, required annual training, and land appraisal requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/23 |
2023-03-23 | House | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2023-03-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-17 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 2 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry and Business |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 10:25 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Political Subdivisions |