ND HB1524 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of privacy practices in the data broker industry.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of privacy practices in the data broker industry.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Glenn Bosch [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
Sen. Kyle Davison [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 44 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |