ND HB1543 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 037 nays 055
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 037 nays 055
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Flakoll, Taylor A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 44-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the procurement of North Dakota food products; and to provide for a report to the legislative council regarding the procurement of North Dakota food products.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Flakoll, Taylor A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 44-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the procurement of North Dakota food products; and to provide for a report to the legislative council regarding the procurement of North Dakota food products.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Ben Vig [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 037 nays 055 | |
2009-04-16 | Concurred | |
2009-03-19 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-19 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-03-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-06 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 049 nays 045 | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 008 n 003 | |
2009-01-29 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1543.html |