ND HCR3004 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Council to study Indian education issues.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Council to study Indian education issues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-09 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-06 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-03-05 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-01-23 | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba3004.html |