ND HCR3019 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Cook, Hogue, Lyson A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Council to study Section 18 of Article X of the Constitution of North Dakota.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Cook, Hogue, Lyson A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Council to study Section 18 of Article X of the Constitution of North Dakota.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Berg [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Gary Sukut [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-24 | Second reading, adopted as amended | |
2009-04-24 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-23 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Hogue Oehlke Triplett | |
2009-04-13 | Conf comm appointed Hatlestad Schatz Griffin | |
2009-04-13 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-03 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-03 | Second reading, adopted as amended | |
2009-04-03 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-24 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-03-11 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-03-11 | Received from House | |
2009-03-10 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-03 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 008 n 000 | |
2009-02-11 | Committee Hearing 03:00 | |
2009-01-29 | Introduced, first reading, referred Constitutional Revision |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba3019.html |