ND HCR3031 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Council to study eminent domain laws as they relate to pipeline siting.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Council to study eminent domain laws as they relate to pipeline siting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-10 | Motion to reconsider laid on table | |
2009-04-10 | Second reading, failed to adopt | |
2009-04-03 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-19 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 008 n 004 | |
2009-02-12 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-29 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba3031.html |