ND HCR3039 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Klein A concurrent resolution urging the President and Congress to develop energy resources on the nation's Outer Continental Shelf, promote domestic energy production, and to not impose additional taxes on America's energy producers.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Klein A concurrent resolution urging the President and Congress to develop energy resources on the nation's Outer Continental Shelf, promote domestic energy production, and to not impose additional taxes on America's energy producers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-04-08 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-08 | Second reading, adopted as amended | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-19 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-12 | Committee Hearing 11:30 | |
2009-01-29 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba3039.html |