ND HCR3059 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-10 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-10 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Triplett A concurrent resolution to create and enact a new section to article X of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to establishment and use of an oil tax trust fund; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Triplett A concurrent resolution to create and enact a new section to article X of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to establishment and use of an oil tax trust fund; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-10 | Second reading, failed to adopt | |
2009-03-06 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 008 n 001 | |
2009-02-25 | Committee Hearing 04:30 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Constitutional Revision |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba3059.html |