ND SB2054 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 24-02-02.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to department of transportation agreements with tribal governments.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 24-02-02.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to department of transportation agreements with tribal governments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-03 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-03 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-02 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-02-27 | Second reading, passed, yeas 087 nays 000 | |
2009-02-26 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-26 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation | |
2009-02-05 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-04 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-02-03 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2009-02-02 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-30 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 001 | |
2009-01-08 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2054.html |