ND SB2064 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision d of subsection 2 of section 44-08-04, subsections 1, 2, 3, and 7 of section 54-03-20, subsection 1 of section 54-06-09, and section 54-35-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to legislative compensation and state officer and employee lodging and mileage reimbursement; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision d of subsection 2 of section 44-08-04, subsections 1, 2, 3, and 7 of section 54-03-20, subsection 1 of section 54-06-09, and section 54-35-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to legislative compensation and state officer and employee lodging and mileage reimbursement; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-29 | Emergency clause failed | |
2009-04-29 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 054 nays 036 | |
2009-04-29 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading passed, y 047 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-23 | Appointed Horne to replace Nelson on conf comm | |
2009-04-21 | Appointed Horne to replace Nelson on conf comm | |
2009-04-20 | Conf comm appointed Berg Grande Schneider | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed Dever Oehlke Nelson | |
2009-04-17 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-15 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-14 | Emergency clause failed | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 054 nays 038 | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-10 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 011 | |
2009-03-16 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-16 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-03-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 011 n 001 | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans A | |
2009-02-18 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-17 | Second reading passed, y 042 n 004 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-02-13 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-12 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-10 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-06 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-16 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans A |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2064.html |