ND SB2087 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 037 nays 056
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 037 nays 056
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exempting information regarding individuals applying for certain university system positions from open records requirements.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exempting information regarding individuals applying for certain university system positions from open records requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 037 nays 056 | |
2009-04-03 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Reported back amend, dnp, placed on calendar y 007 n 006 | |
2009-03-20 | Rereferred to Education | |
2009-03-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-18 | Reported back amend, dnp, placed on calendar y 011 n 003 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-02 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-30 | Second reading, passed, yeas 030 nays 015 | |
2009-01-29 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-28 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-01-22 | Rereferred to Education | |
2009-01-21 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 004 n 001 | |
2009-01-14 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2087.html |