ND SB2110 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new sections to chapter 54-60 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the rural development office and the North Dakota rural development council; to amend and reenact sections 10-30.5-04, 54-34.3-01, 54-34.3-03, and 54-34.3-04, subsection 2 of section 54-34.3-13, sections 54-34.3-15, 54-34.4-01, and 54-34.4-02, subsection 1 of section 54-34.4-03, section 54-60-03, subsection 3 of section 54-60-04, and sections 54-60-06 and 54-60-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the powers of the North Dakota Development Fund, Incorporated, the department of commerce division of economic development and finance, the department of commerce division of tourism, the state tourism policy, the commissioner of commerce, the North Dakota economic development foundation, the North Dakota commerce cabinet, and the department of commerce division of workforce development; and to repeal sections 54-34.3-05, 54-34.4-04, and 54-60-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the finance office, the motion picture development office, and target industries.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new sections to chapter 54-60 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the rural development office and the North Dakota rural development council; to amend and reenact sections 10-30.5-04, 54-34.3-01, 54-34.3-03, and 54-34.3-04, subsection 2 of section 54-34.3-13, sections 54-34.3-15, 54-34.4-01, and 54-34.4-02, subsection 1 of section 54-34.4-03, section 54-60-03, subsection 3 of section 54-60-04, and sections 54-60-06 and 54-60-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the powers of the North Dakota Development Fund, Incorporated, the department of commerce division of economic development and finance, the department of commerce division of tourism, the state tourism policy, the commissioner of commerce, the North Dakota economic development foundation, the North Dakota commerce cabinet, and the department of commerce division of workforce development; and to repeal sections 54-34.3-05, 54-34.4-04, and 54-60-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the finance office, the motion picture development office, and target industries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-01 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-27 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-23 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate accede) | |
2009-04-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-04-23 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-22 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate accede) | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Nottestad N. Johnson Amerman | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Klein Nodland Behm | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-10 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-03-09 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 090 nays 000 | |
2009-03-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-02-02 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-30 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 000 | |
2009-01-29 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-28 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-22 | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-01-21 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-13 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2110.html |