ND SB2129 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 50-06-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the alternatives-to-abortion program; and to provide for an appropriation to the department of health and human services to establish and maintain the alternatives-to-abortion program.
Title
The alternatives-to-abortion program; and to provide for an appropriation to the department of health and human services to establish and maintain the alternatives-to-abortion program.
Sponsors
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Rep. Carrie McLeod [R] |
Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29 |
2023-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2023-04-20 | House | Conference committee appointed S. Olson Schneider Stemen |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Cleary Weston Davison |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-04-17 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 80 nays 10 |
2023-04-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 1 5 |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-03-22 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 0 |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:20 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 0 2 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 04:28 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:06 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:24 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Human Services |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |