ND SB2168 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 15-10-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to jurisdiction and authority of law enforcement officers employed by institutions of higher education.
Title
Jurisdiction and authority of law enforcement officers employed by institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Jim Roers [R] | Rep. Zachary Ista [D] |
Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-15 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2021-04-09 | House | Conference committee appointed Vetter Magrum Hanson |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Larson Dwyer Bakke |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-26 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 78 nays 12 |
2021-03-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3 |
2021-03-19 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 6 1 |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |