ND SB2177 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 046
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 046
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Delmore, Kempenich, Ruby A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 39-04-19, 54-27-19, 54-27-19.1, 57-43.1-06, and 57-43.2-04.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the collection and distribution of highway funds; and to repeal section 39-04.2-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the registration fee for the public transportation fund.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Delmore, Kempenich, Ruby A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 39-04-19, 54-27-19, 54-27-19.1, 57-43.1-06, and 57-43.2-04.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the collection and distribution of highway funds; and to repeal section 39-04.2-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the registration fee for the public transportation fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-19 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 046 | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 001 | |
2009-01-30 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-26 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-26 | Reported back, do pass, y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-22 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-09 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2177.html |