ND SB2198 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 54-52.4-02, 54-52.4-04, and 54-52.4-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state employee family medical leave.
Title
State employee family medical leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29 |
2023-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-25 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 2 |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Conference committee appointed Wagner J. Johnson Schauer |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Axtman Larson Piepkorn |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-04-13 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2023-04-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2023-02-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Workforce Development |