ND SB2207 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 010 nays 032
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 010 nays 032
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Conrad, Martinson, Nathe A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 26.1-36 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the assignment of dental insurance benefits to a dentist or oral surgeon.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Conrad, Martinson, Nathe A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 26.1-36 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the assignment of dental insurance benefits to a dentist or oral surgeon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-21 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 010 nays 032 | |
2009-01-20 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 11:15 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2207.html |