ND SB2216 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Delmore, S. Meyer, Mueller, Porter A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 12.1-34-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reimbursement for medical screening examinations that precede child forensic medical examinations and acute forensic medical examinations; to provide an appropriation; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Delmore, S. Meyer, Mueller, Porter A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 12.1-34-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reimbursement for medical screening examinations that precede child forensic medical examinations and acute forensic medical examinations; to provide an appropriation; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-17 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading passed, y 047 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-04-07 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-07 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-07 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 088 nays 000 | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 018 n 005 | |
2009-03-18 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-18 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-02-16 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-02-10 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2009-01-22 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 11:30 | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2216.html |