ND SB2222 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. DeKrey, Kaldor A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-15-28 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to discontinuance of county emergency fund levies.
Title
Introduced by Rep. DeKrey, Kaldor A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-15-28 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to discontinuance of county emergency fund levies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-17 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-03-20 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-03-20 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 083 nays 000 | |
2009-03-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 010 n 000 | |
2009-03-12 | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation | |
2009-03-10 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 001 | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-17 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 001 | |
2009-02-12 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 001 | |
2009-02-09 | Committee Hearing 11:15 | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2222.html |