ND SB2258 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 021 nays 025
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 021 nays 025
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Pinkerton, Potter, Schneider A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 34-01-20 and 34-11.1-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to whistleblower protection for private and public employees.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Pinkerton, Potter, Schneider A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 34-01-20 and 34-11.1-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to whistleblower protection for private and public employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-19 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 021 nays 025 | |
2009-02-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back amended, without recommendation y 006 n 000 | |
2009-02-13 | Rereferred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-12 | Reported back without recommendation y 006 n 000 | |
2009-02-03 | Committee Hearing 09:15 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2258.html |