ND SB2266 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Delmore, Klein, Kreidt A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15-11-39 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the nursing education consortium; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Delmore, Klein, Kreidt A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15-11-39 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the nursing education consortium; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Tom Seymour [D] | Sen. John Warner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-29 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 090 nays 000 | |
2009-04-29 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-16 | Appointed Warner to replace Heckaman on conf comm | |
2009-04-15 | Conf comm appointed R. Kelsch Delzer Hunskor | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed J. Lee Erbele Heckaman | |
2009-04-14 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-08 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-08 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 090 nays 000 | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 022 n 001 | |
2009-03-17 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-11 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 014 n 000 | |
2009-02-16 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-09 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-22 | Rereferred to Human Services | |
2009-01-22 | Request return from committee | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2266.html |