ND SB2296 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 019 nays 024
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 019 nays 024
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Delmore, Hawken, Myxter A BILL for an Act to provide a student loan reduction for residents employed in early childhood education or child development.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Delmore, Hawken, Myxter A BILL for an Act to provide a student loan reduction for residents employed in early childhood education or child development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-09 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 019 nays 024 | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 003 n 002 | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2296.html |