ND SB2340 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 021 nays 025
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 021 nays 025
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Brandenburg, Weiler A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-39.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales and use tax exemption for sales by thrift stores owned and operated by nonprofit corporations; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Brandenburg, Weiler A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-39.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales and use tax exemption for sales by thrift stores owned and operated by nonprofit corporations; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-19 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 021 nays 025 | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 008 n 006 | |
2009-02-16 | Committee Hearing 11:30 | |
2009-02-10 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 002 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-20 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2340.html |