ND SB2343 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 019 nays 028
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 019 nays 028
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Boucher, Froelich A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-03.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring the presentation of information during the organizational session of the legislative assembly which relates to native Americans.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Boucher, Froelich A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-03.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring the presentation of information during the organizational session of the legislative assembly which relates to native Americans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 019 nays 028 | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 004 n 001 | |
2009-02-06 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-20 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2343.html |