ND SB2346 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 37-14-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county veterans' service officers.
Title
County veterans' service officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Rep. Alan Fehr [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 13 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 77 |
2015-04-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 23 0 0 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | House | Amendment adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |