ND SB2388 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. DeKrey A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 and a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit for an employer maintaining payment of salary and related retirement plan contributions for an employee called to active military duty as a member of a reserve or national guard component; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Introduced by Rep. DeKrey A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 and a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit for an employer maintaining payment of salary and related retirement plan contributions for an employee called to active military duty as a member of a reserve or national guard component; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-23 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-18 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-03-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 010 n 001 | |
2009-03-06 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-18 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-02-17 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-17 | Amended on floor | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-13 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-02-10 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-10 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-09 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-02-06 | Rereferred to Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-05 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2388.html |