ND SB2408 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 046
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 046
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Glassheim, Svedjan, Uglem A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of commerce for a base realignment grant program.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Glassheim, Svedjan, Uglem A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of commerce for a base realignment grant program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-19 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 046 | |
2009-02-18 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 014 n 000 | |
2009-02-11 | Committee Hearing 03:30 | |
2009-02-06 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-06 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 001 | |
2009-02-03 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2009-01-27 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2408.html |