ND SB2425 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Boucher A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 54-44-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring the director of the office of management and budget to develop a proposal for the construction of office buildings on the capitol grounds.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Boucher A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 54-44-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring the director of the office of management and budget to develop a proposal for the construction of office buildings on the capitol grounds.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Ray Holmberg [R] | Sen. Aaron Krauter [D] | Sen. David O'Connell [D] |
Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-10 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-08 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-04-08 | Second reading, passed, yeas 075 nays 015 | |
2009-04-02 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 005 | |
2009-03-13 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-18 | Motion to reconsider laid on table | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-02-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-02-06 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-27 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2425.html |