ND SB2442 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 031 nays 061
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 031 nays 061
Summary
(Approved by the Delayed Bills Committee) A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative council study of blue cross blue shield of North Dakota to determine whether legislative changes are appropriate to the laws relating to nonprofit mutual insurance companies.
Title
(Approved by the Delayed Bills Committee) A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative council study of blue cross blue shield of North Dakota to determine whether legislative changes are appropriate to the laws relating to nonprofit mutual insurance companies.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Mathern [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 031 nays 061 | |
2009-04-15 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 004 | |
2009-04-13 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-04-09 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-04-09 | Received from Senate | |
2009-04-08 | Second reading, passed, yeas 044 nays 003 | |
2009-04-07 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-30 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-03-24 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2442.html |