ND SCR4013 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Berg, DeKrey, Kretschmar A concurrent resolution for the amendment of section 13 of article I of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to an exception of the right to trial by jury.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Berg, DeKrey, Kretschmar A concurrent resolution for the amendment of section 13 of article I of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to an exception of the right to trial by jury.
Sponsors
Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Second reading, failed to adopt | |
2009-04-02 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 002 | |
2009-03-18 | Committee Hearing 03:30 | |
2009-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Constitutional Revision | |
2009-02-26 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-25 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-02-12 | Reported back without recommendation y 006 n 000 | |
2009-02-04 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba4013.html |