ND SCR4022 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Amerman, Ekstrom, Wolf A concurrent resolution urging Congress and the President of the United States to enact federal legislation to repeal perverse federal tax subsidies to United States companies that move manufacturing operations and American jobs offshore.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Amerman, Ekstrom, Wolf A concurrent resolution urging Congress and the President of the United States to enact federal legislation to repeal perverse federal tax subsidies to United States companies that move manufacturing operations and American jobs offshore.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-02 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-20 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-20 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar y 011 n 000 | |
2009-03-11 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-26 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-25 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-02-11 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2009-01-30 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba4022.html |