ND SCR4030 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 010 nays 082
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 010 nays 082
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Glassheim, Hawken A concurrent resolution to create and enact a new section to article X of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to establishment and use of a legacy fund; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Glassheim, Hawken A concurrent resolution to create and enact a new section to article X of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to establishment and use of a legacy fund; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 010 nays 082 | |
2009-04-15 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Reported back amend, dnp, placed on calendar y 007 n 001 | |
2009-04-13 | Rereferred to Constitutional Revision | |
2009-04-10 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 008 n 001 | |
2009-03-23 | Committee Hearing 03:30 | |
2009-03-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Constitutional Revision | |
2009-03-17 | Received from Senate | |
2009-03-13 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-11 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-05 | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation | |
2009-03-05 | Amendment failed, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-04 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba4030.html |