ND SCR4036 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
(Approved by the Delayed Bills Committee) A concurrent resolution urging the United States Department of Agriculture to implement livestock indemnity program regulations that account for the fair market value of newborn calves and their cost of production.
Title
(Approved by the Delayed Bills Committee) A concurrent resolution urging the United States Department of Agriculture to implement livestock indemnity program regulations that account for the fair market value of newborn calves and their cost of production.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-04-16 | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-04-14 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture | |
2009-04-14 | Received from Senate | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-04-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-04-13 | Committee Hearing 11:15 | |
2009-04-09 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba4036.html |