NE LB1006 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to rehearings under the Tax Equalization and Review Commission Act
Title
Change provisions relating to rehearings under the Tax Equalization and Review Commission Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34607 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1006.pdf |