NE LB1021 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Adopt the High School Activities Association Act
Title
Adopt the High School Activities Association Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Avery [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-03-12 | Lautenbaugh MO87 prevailed | |
2010-03-11 | Lautenbaugh AM2065 filed | |
2010-03-11 | Lautenbaugh MO87 Bracket until April 14, 2010 filed | |
2010-03-11 | Avery AM2033 pending | |
2010-03-11 | Education AM1969 pending | |
2010-03-02 | Avery AM2033 filed | |
2010-02-23 | Education AM1969 filed | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on General File with AM1969 | |
2010-02-18 | Avery priority bill | |
2010-01-29 | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2010 | |
2010-01-22 | Referred to Education Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9496 |