NE LB1021 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for an expedited review of certain redevelopment plans under the Community Development Law
Title
Provide for an expedited review of certain redevelopment plans under the Community Development Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM2988 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM2988 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 13, 2020 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER239 adopted |
2020-08-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER239 filed |
2020-08-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER239 |
2020-08-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-08-04 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2988 adopted |
2020-08-04 | Legislature | Chambers MO208 withdrawn |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO208 pending |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO208 Recommit to Urban Affairs Committee filed |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO207 withdrawn |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO207 Bracket until August 06, 2020 filed |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2988 pending |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2988 filed |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2988 |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Groene priority bill |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2020 |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |