NE LB1036 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for issuance of free annual combination fishing, fur-harvesting, and hunting permits, habitat stamps, aquatic habitat stamps, and Nebraska migratory waterfowl stamps to certain veterans and members of the armed forces of the United States
Title
Provide for issuance of free annual combination fishing, fur-harvesting, and hunting permits, habitat stamps, aquatic habitat stamps, and Nebraska migratory waterfowl stamps to certain veterans and members of the armed forces of the United States
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-31 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |