NE LB1047 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change requirements regarding annual load and capability reports filed with the Nebraska Power Review Board
Title
Change requirements regarding annual load and capability reports filed with the Nebraska Power Review Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |