NE LB1072 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor on April 14, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor on April 14, 2010
Summary
Change state aid and levy limits for community colleges
Title
Change state aid and levy limits for community colleges
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Adams [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor on April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2010 | |
2010-04-12 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-12 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 | |
2010-04-12 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Adams AM2484 adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Adams AM2484 filed | |
2010-04-06 | Adams AM2448 withdrawn | |
2010-04-06 | Enrollment and Review ER8223 adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Adams AM2448 filed | |
2010-03-30 | Enrollment and Review ER8223 filed | |
2010-03-30 | Placed on Select File with ER8223 | |
2010-03-29 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-29 | Adams AM2298 adopted | |
2010-03-29 | Education AM2194 adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Adams AM2298 filed | |
2010-03-16 | Education AM2194 filed | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on General File with AM2194 | |
2010-02-19 | Adams priority bill | |
2010-01-29 | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2010 | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Education Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9739 |