NE LB1078 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent to appropriate funds for increase in rates for child welfare service providers
Title
State intent to appropriate funds for increase in rates for child welfare service providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |