NE LB1092 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require information and training regarding the disposal of mercury-containing light bulbs
Title
Require information and training regarding the disposal of mercury-containing light bulbs
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Fulton [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-23 | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2012 | |
2012-01-20 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=16091 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1092.pdf |