NE LB1092 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - DeKay explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - DeKay explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Online Age Verification Liability Act
Title
Adopt the Online Age Verification Liability Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Murman [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 35-3-11 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Legislature - Judiciary AM2585 adopted (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Legislature - Murman AM3198 adopted (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO1312 failed (Y: 5 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Legislature - Judiciary AM2585 adopted (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Legislature - Murman AM3198 adopted (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO1312 failed (Y: 5 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | DeKay explanation of vote |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 16, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 35-3-11 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Murman MO1317 not considered |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Murman MO1318 withdrawn |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Murman FA304 withdrawn |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1311 withdrawn |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1313 withdrawn |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER118 adopted |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER118 filed |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER118 |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Murman MO1318 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Murman MO1317 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed |
2024-03-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-03-27 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2585 adopted |
2024-03-27 | Legislature | Murman AM3198 adopted |
2024-03-27 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1314 withdrawn |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1311 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1313 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1314 Reconsider the vote on MO1312 filed |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1312 failed |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1312 Bracket until April 11, 2024 filed |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Murman FA306 withdrawn |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Murman FA305 withdrawn |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Murman MO1294 withdrawn |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Murman MO1293 withdrawn |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Murman MO1292 withdrawn |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Murman AM3198 to AM2585 filed |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Dover name added |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Murman FA306 to AM2585 filed |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Murman FA305 to AM2585 filed |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Murman FA304 filed |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Murman MO1294 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Murman MO1293 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Murman MO1292 Bracket until April 18, 2024 filed |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2585 filed |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2585 |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Murman priority bill |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |