NE LB1093 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1028 amended into LB1093 by AM2391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1028 amended into LB1093 by AM2391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Bioscience Steering Committee, redefine a term relating to an internship grant program, change the Business Innovation Act, and require reports on the Nebraska Innovation Campus
Title
Create the Bioscience Steering Committee, redefine a term relating to an internship grant program, change the Business Innovation Act, and require reports on the Nebraska Innovation Campus
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1028 amended into LB1093 by AM2391 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1017 amended into LB1093 by AM2391 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB987 amended into LB1093 by AM2632 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB560 amended into LB1093 by AM2391 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Report |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 01, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST76 |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2632 adopted |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Mello AM2547 adopted |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER188 adopted |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2632 filed |
2016-03-16 | Legislature | Mello AM2547 filed |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER188 filed |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER188 |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2391 adopted |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2391 filed |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2391 |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | Appropriations priority bill |
2016-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2016 |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |