NE LB1093 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1093 amended into LB1008 by AM2737
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1093 amended into LB1008 by AM2737
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent regarding appropriations for nursing facility services under the medical assistance program
Title
State intent regarding appropriations for nursing facility services under the medical assistance program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1093 amended into LB1008 by AM2737 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41358 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1093.pdf |