NE LB1095 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require employer identification numbers and the use of the federal immigration verification system
Title
Require employer identification numbers and the use of the federal immigration verification system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-02-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2016 |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Rereferred to Revenue Committee |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28211 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1095.pdf |